Washington County Senators

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 13)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0322 / CH0098
    (HB1320 / CH0097)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 98Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0323Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Serving Underage Individuals - PenaltiesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0324 / CH0317
    (HB1202)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Serving Underage Individuals - PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0340 / CH0321
    (HB1156 / CH0320)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 321Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0714
    (HB1218)
Possession of Medical Cannabis in Local Correctional Facilities – ProhibitionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsFinance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
By Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
SB0847
    (HB0903 / CH0780)
Washington County - Highway Parking - Prohibition on Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled VehicleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0886
    (HB1477)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Work and Community Engagement Requirements - WaiverIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceBy Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
SB0887 / CH0319
    (HB1147 / CH0318)
Washington County - Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Minimum Percentage of DisabilityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 319Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0888Washington County Board of Education - Teachers and Other Personnel - Conclusion of NegotiationsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0889
    (HB1321 / CH0099)
Washington County – Public Facilities BondsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB1147
    (HB1702)
Juveniles – Reportable OffensesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeJuvenile Law (E3)
SB1148 / CH0615
    (HB1704)
Washington County - Advisory School Design Review Committee - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 615Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1162 / CH0421
    (HB1712)
Washington County - Superintendent of Schools - Appointment and ReappointmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.