Delegate John L. Bohanan, Jr.

2013 Regular Session

District 29B, St. Mary's County

Total Bills: 30 (Primary Sponsor: 4, Co-sponsor: 25, By Request: 1)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0007 / CH0346Southern Maryland Higher Education Council - ModificationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Appropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryHigher Education (F2)
HB0831 / CH0564
    (SB0828 / CH0563)
St. Mary's College of Maryland - Tuition Freeze and DeSousa-Brent Scholars Completion GrantApproved by the Governor - Chapter 564Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryHigher Education (F2)
HB0992Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - St. Mary's County - Pathway's Facility RenovationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1113Procurement - Disclosure Requirements and PenaltiesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0167 / CH0352
    (SB0042 / CH0436)
State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Emancipation DayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0322
    (SB0222)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Yellow Dot ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0357 / CH0235
    (SB0344 / CH0234)
Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and PenaltyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 235Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0380 / CH0617Income Tax - Joint Returns - Married CouplesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 617Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0390 / CH0535
    (SB0741 / CH0534)
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of TrusteesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0408 / CH0258
    (SB0404 / CH0257)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management EquipmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0453 / CH0372Education - Maryland Center for School SafetyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 372Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0503Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0524
    (SB0643)
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
RulesCo-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0578
    (SB0023)
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care PremiumsIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0592Election Law - Reporting of Precinct ResultsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0685
    (SB0633 / CH0512)
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost ShareIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0689Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up BusinessIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0812Hunting - Certificate of Competency and Safety - Veterans and Active Duty MilitaryIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0833
    (SB0740 / CH0533)
College Readiness and Completion Act of 2013In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB1019 / CH0293
    (SB0586 / CH0292)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland RegionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorAgriculture (M4)
HB1077Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Reporting Lost or StolenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1119 / CH0317
    (SB0752 / CH0316)
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Appropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorSocial Services - Generally (O1)
HB1176 / CH0471
    (SB0461 / CH0470)
Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - AccessibilityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 471Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1209 / CH0268
    (SB0436 / CH0267)
Recordation Taxes - ExemptionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1264Task Force to Study Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Public Officials Charged with or Convicted of a CrimeIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1337 / CH0530
    (SB0702 / CH0529)
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital ProjectsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1342 / CH0678Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Governing Board and Data TransfersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 678Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1376
    (SB0734)
State Board of Education - Mathematics - Graduation RequirementIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1494 / CH0688
    (SB0876)
Correctional Services - Standards for Correctional Facilities - FundingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 688Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0560 / CH0005
    (SB0538)
Public-Private PartnershipsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:45 A.M.