Former Delegate John H. Briscoe


Delegate John H. Briscoe
TenureMember of the House of Delegates 1962 to 1979, representing District 29, St. Mary's County
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
1973-1979
Speaker of the House
1971-1973
Ways and Means Committee (Chair)
1969
Environmental Matters Committee
1967
Natural Resources Committee (Chair)
1965-1979
Legislative Policy Committee
Biographical Information
Service on Legislative Policy Committee began in 1962
Born in Leonardtown, Maryland, April 10, 1934
Mount St. Mary's College, B.A. 1956
University of Baltimore School of Law, LL.B. 1960
Admitted to Maryland Bar 1960
Associate Judge, St. Mary's County Circuit Court, 7th Judicial Circuit 1986-2002
County Administrative Judge, St. Mary's County Circuit Court, 7th Judicial Circuit, January 17, 1986 to July 31, 2002
Died in Hollywood, Maryland, January 1, 2014

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.