Senator James Brochin

2014 Regular Session

District 42, Baltimore County

Total Bills: 32 (Primary Sponsor: 11, Co-sponsor: 19, By Request: 2)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0136Criminal Law - Second-Degree Murder - PenaltyIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0163Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit and Exclusion AmountIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0164
    (HB0712)
Crimes - Use of a Firearm in the Commission of a Crime - Diminution Credits and SentencingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
SB0174Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of PaymentIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryReal Property (N1)
SB0188
    (HB0128)
State Retirement and Pension System - Military Service Credit - ExceptionIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0239Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and LimitationsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0290 / CH0480
    (HB0384)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 480Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB0350 / CH0490Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0623
    (HB0588)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Lutherville Volunteer Fire Company Station ExpansionIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0720Courts - Prosecution for Sex Offense - Evidence of Prior ActIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0943
    (HB0507)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Towson High School StadiumIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0078Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0143
    (HB0353)
Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0165
    (HB0117)
Education - Maryland School Assessment - Request for WaiverIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0252
    (HB0700)
Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight - Public Hearings on Workplace Bullying in State AgenciesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Co-SponsorState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0283Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company EmployeesIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
SB0359Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - Impervious Surface - DefinitionIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
SB0360Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - ProhibitionIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
SB0404 / CH0058
    (HB0099)
Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing StatementApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Finance
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0414General Assembly - Legislative Redistricting - Plans to be Introduced as a BillIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0454 / CH0168
    (HB0701 / CH0420)
Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping for the Purpose of Committing a Sexual Crime - PenaltyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0542
    (HB0294 / CH0221)
Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and In-Service Training Requirements (Christopher's Law)Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
SB0646
    (HB1253)
State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need ReviewIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnFinance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0660 / CH0186
    (HB0667 / CH0187)
Crimes Relating to Animals - Unauthorized Surgical Devocalization of Cat or Dog - PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 186Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0721Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Down Syndrome (Micah's Law)In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
SB0740
    (HB0915)
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment CommissionIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
SB0914
    (HB1270)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
SB0927
    (HB1323)
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund ProgramIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1114Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance and Representation by the Office of the Public DefenderIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SJ0001 / JR0003
    (HJ0002)
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States ConstitutionSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0333 / CH0111
    (HB0307 / CH0112)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of ProofApproved by the Governor - Chapter 111Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationFamily Law (D4)
SB0602
    (HB0739 / CH0612)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.