Former Senator Thomas L. Bromwell

District 8


Senator Thomas L. Bromwell
TenureMember of the Senate from 1983 to May 24, 2002, representing District 8, Baltimore County and Baltimore City. Resigned from Senate effective May 24, 2002.
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past Senate Service
1987-1990
Majority Whip
1983-2002
Finance Committee (Chair 1995-2002)
1987-2002
Executive Nominations Committee
1991-2002
Rules Committee (Chair 1991-1995)
1995-2002
Legislative Policy Committee
1995-2002
Spending Affordability Committee
1983-1990
Joint Committee on Management of Public Funds
1991-1994
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
1987-1994
Workers' Compensation Benefit and Insurance Oversight Committee (Senate Chair)
1985-1986
Joint Committee on the Ports
2001-2002
Senate Committee on Redistricting
2002
Committee on the Selection of the State Treasurer
1985-1994
Chair, Baltimore County Delegation
Past House Service
1979-1983
Constitutional and Administrative Law Committee
Biographical Information
Born in Baltimore, Maryland, March 9, 1949
Essex Community College, A.A., 1972
Maryland Air National Guard
U. S. Air Force
Five children
July 24, 2007, pleaded guilty in U. S. District Court to racketeering conspiracy and filing a false tax return. Sentenced on November 16, 2007 to seven years in prison and three years supervised release.

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.