Former Delegate Anthony G. Brown

District 25


Delegate Anthony G. Brown
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 13, 1999 to January 10, 2007, representing District 25, Prince George's County
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
2004-2007
Majority Whip
2003-2007
Judiciary Committee
1999-2003
Economic Matters Committee
2006-2007
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
2005
Legislative Policy Committee
2000-2007
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
2003-2004
Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive and Legislative Review
2000-2003
Joint Technology Oversight Committee
2003-2004
Special Committee on Higher Education Affordability and Accessibility
Biographical Information
Born in Huntington, New York, November 21, 1961
Harvard University, A.B. Government 1984
Harvard University Law School, J.D. 1992
Admitted to New York Bar 1993 (inactive); Maryland Bar 1994; District of Columbia Bar 1994 (resigned)
Served in U.S. Army, Aviation Officer, Captain 1984-1989
Served in U.S. Army Reserve 1989- (Colonel in Judge Advocate General's Corps 2007- ;served in Iraq with 353rd Civil Affairs Command as Senior Consultant to Iraqi Ministry of Displacement and Migration 2004-2005; Commander, 153rd Legal Support Organization 2008-2011)
Lt. Governor of Maryland since January 17, 2007
Married, two children

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.