Delegate Emmett C. Burns, Jr.

2014 Regular Session

District 10, Baltimore County

Total Bills: 36 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 35, By Request: 1)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0187Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0243 / CH0591Vehicle Laws - Unauthorized Use of Rented Motor Vehicle - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 591Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0278Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum AgeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0283
    (SB0034)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0294 / CH0221
    (SB0542)
Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and In-Service Training Requirements (Christopher's Law)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221Judiciary
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0405Environment - Sales of Nonbiodegradable Cigarettes - ProhibitedIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB0411
    (SB0494)
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - State Correctional OfficersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB0443
    (SB0589)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0469Speed Monitoring Systems - School Zones - Days of OperationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0518
    (SB0489)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Youth in Transition SchoolIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2014 - 10:30 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0543
    (SB0594)
Hepatitis C - Opportunity for Testing and Follow-Up Health CareIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0640Labor and Employment - Intern Transportation Costs - Reimbursement by EmployersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0650Baltimore County - Use of Speed Monitoring SystemsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0727 / CH0282
    (SB0232 / CH0281)
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - ApplicabilityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 282Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0773Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0798 / CH0330
    (SB0701 / CH0329)
Education - Children With Disabilities - Habilitative Services InformationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0812 / CH0616Education - Middle Schools - Automated External DefibrillatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 616Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0830
    (SB0287)
Alcoholic Beverages - Shipment of Kosher Wine Sold at RetailIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0856 / CH0259
    (SB1065)
Workgroup on Workforce Development for Community Health WorkersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0951 / CH0625
    (SB0774)
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1006 / CH0436Task Force to Study the Impact of Expanding Credit and Noncredit Courses for Students With Intellectual and Developmental Disabilities - ExtensionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 436Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB1159 / CH0447Cigarettes - County Retail License Holder - Prohibited SalesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 447Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1165 / CH0349
    (SB0875 / CH0348)
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 349Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1169Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up BusinessIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1193Task Force to Study Implementation of Strategies for Preventing Sexual Exploitation of Clients by Health ProfessionalsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1194
    (SB1039)
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - EvaluationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB1196
    (SB0065)
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras RequiredIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1222 / CH0647Ruth M. Kirk Public Social Work ScholarshipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB1234
    (SB0870)
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia - PenaltiesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1307 / CH0451Children in Out-of-Home Placement - Annual Notice of BenefitsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 451Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB1316
    (SB0043)
Crimes - Sale of Drug Paraphernalia to a Minor - Local Law Authorizing Business License Revocation for a Second or Subsequent ViolationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1323
    (SB0927)
Public School Construction - Creative Financing StudyIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsAppropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1343
    (SB0969)
Department of Veterans Affairs - Opioids Time Lock Dispenser Pilot ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1349 / CH0249
    (SB0868)
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HJ0008
    (SJ0008)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFinancial Institutions (I1)
HB0295 / CH0262
    (SB0331)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
By Request - AdministrationPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.