Delegate Emmett C. Burns, Jr.

2013 Regular Session

District 10, Baltimore County

Total Bills: 34 (Primary Sponsor: 1, Co-sponsor: 31, By Request: 2)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0773Regulated Firearms - Encoded Ammunition - TaxIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
PrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0001Criminal Law - Cannabimimetic Agents - ProhibitionVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0079
    (SB0135)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Youth in Transition SchoolIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0089
    (SB0008 / CH0161)
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure Replacement SurchargeIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceEconomic Matters
1/24/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
FinanceCo-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0092
    (SB0133)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Easter Seals Adult Day Services Center ExpansionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0093
    (SB0134)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Diversified Housing DevelopmentIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0167 / CH0352
    (SB0042 / CH0436)
State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Emancipation DayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0248
    (SB0291)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Baltimore County Humane SocietyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0267
    (SB0109 / CH0442)
Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Research - Synthetic CannabinoidsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0303 / CH0365Task Force to Study Point-of-Care Testing for Lead PoisoningApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0322
    (SB0222)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Yellow Dot ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0336
    (SB0009)
Criminal Law - Table Games and Video Lottery Terminals - Playing by Individual Under 21 Years of AgeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0489 / CH0373
    (SB0504)
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - ExpansionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0490
    (SB0420)
Crimes - Restricted Firearm Ammunition - Prohibition on Possession and UseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0503Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0569Environment - Wastewater Treatment Facilities - Financial Assistance StudyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB0603
    (SB0487)
Home Act of 2013In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHuman Relations (D5)
HB0683
    (SB0700)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0768Food Service Facilities - Industrially Produced Trans Fat - ProhibitionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0785
    (SB0375 / CH0247)
Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Services Businesses Act - ScopeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0862Higher Education - In-State Tuition - Reduction for EducatorsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0877 / CH0555
    (SB0811 / CH0554)
Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt RegulationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 555Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0969Commission to Consider Mental Health-Related Ways to Limit Mass Violence by Individuals with Antisocial Personality Disorders, Depressive Disorders, or Other Mental IllnessIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1077Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Reporting Lost or StolenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1102
    (SB0684)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying BiomassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1144Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Shopping Carts and Metal PipingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1172
    (SB0806)
Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash RegistersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1176 / CH0471
    (SB0461 / CH0470)
Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - AccessibilityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 471Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1204
    (SB0683)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1247State Government - Frederick Douglass and Harriet Tubman Memorial Statues - Placement and CommissionIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1297 / CH0330
    (SB0897 / CH0329)
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care SettingsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1312
    (SB0456)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - AdministrationBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0295
    (SB0276 / CH0156)
Death Penalty Repeal and Appropriation from Savings to Aid Survivors of Homicide VictimsIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/14/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.