Delegate Michael E. Busch

2013 Regular Session

District 30, Anne Arundel County

Total Bills: 10 (Primary Sponsor: 6, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 4)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0064
    (SB0874)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Mayo Civic Association Community HallIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0065Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis High School Booster Club Concession StandIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB0082Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Anne Arundel County - Shiplap HouseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB0084
    (SB0110)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - William Paca House RestorationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0094Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Children's MuseumIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1458
    (SB0999)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Recreational Center at 9 St. Mary's StreetIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB0226 / CH0003
    (SB0275)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3Economic Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
HB0227 / CH0002
    (SB0278 / CH0001)
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 2Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0560 / CH0005
    (SB0538)
Public-Private PartnershipsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0767 / CH0562
    (SB0820 / CH0561)
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - EstablishmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 562Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherAgriculture (M4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.