Contact Legislator(s)

Message will be sent to Michael E. Busch
Javascript must be enabled on your browser to use this feature. Click 'Close' to continue.

Delegate Michael E. Busch

2013 Regular Session

District 30, Anne Arundel County

Total Bills: 10 (Primary Sponsor: 6, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 4)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0064
    (SB0874)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Mayo Civic Association Community HallIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0065Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis High School Booster Club Concession StandIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB0082Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Anne Arundel County - Shiplap HouseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB0084
    (SB0110)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - William Paca House RestorationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0094Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Children's MuseumIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1458
    (SB0999)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Recreational Center at 9 St. Mary's StreetIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB0226 / CH0003
    (SB0275)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3Economic Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
HB0227 / CH0002
    (SB0278 / CH0001)
Maryland Employment Advancement Right Now (EARN) ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 2Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0560 / CH0005
    (SB0538)
Public-Private PartnershipsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0767 / CH0562
    (SB0820 / CH0561)
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - EstablishmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 562Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherAgriculture (M4)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:45 A.M.