Delegate Michael E. Busch

2014 Regular Session

District 30, Anne Arundel County

Total Bills: 15 (Primary Sponsor: 4, Co-sponsor: 8, By Request: 3)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0008
    (SB0906)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - 1 Martin Street RenovationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 10:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0107
    (SB0907)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - 206 West Social Enterprise ProjectIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 10:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0493
    (SB0488)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Police Department Firing RangeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 10:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1470
    (SB1067)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Bestgate ParkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 10:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0404
    (SB0577 / CH0305)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - State Facilities - CemeteriesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0740 / CH0535
    (SB0603 / CH0534)
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment FundApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0741 / CH0533
    (SB0601 / CH0532)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0742 / CH0531
    (SB0600 / CH0530)
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 531Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0743 / CH0537
    (SB0604 / CH0536)
Income Tax Forms - Graphical Representation of General Fund ExpendituresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 537Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0874 / CH0619County Health Officers - Authority of County Governing Body and Secretary of Health and Mental HygieneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619Health and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB1246 / CH0450
    (SB0771)
Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - EstablishmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 450Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1332 / CH0653Task Force to Study Sports Injuries in High School Female AthletesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 653Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0297
    (SB0332 / CH0002)
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0307 / CH0112
    (SB0333 / CH0111)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of ProofApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - AdministrationFamily Law (D4)
HB0309 / CH0114
    (SB0334 / CH0113)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - AdministrationFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 10, 2014 7:22 P.M.