Delegate Michael E. Busch

2016 Regular Session

District 30A, Anne Arundel County

Total Bills: 23 (Primary Sponsor: 3, Co-sponsor: 20, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0309
    (SB0324 / CH0013)
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016In the Senate - Hearing cancelledAppropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrimaryHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0383 / CH0674
    (SB0426 / CH0673)
Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of AnnapolisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 674Environment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0536
    (SB0478)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - 206 West Social Enterprise ProjectIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0684 / CH0029
    (SB0558)
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - CodifiedEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0686 / CH0030
    (SB0559)
Department of Housing and Community Development - Strategic Demolition and Smart Growth Impact Fund - EstablishmentEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1000
    (SB1040)
Public Safety - Firearms - Terrorist WatchlistIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1001
    (SB0943)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1002
    (SB0906)
Weapon-Free Higher Education ZonesIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsAppropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1003 / CH0557
    (SB0481 / CH0556)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkApproved by the Governor - Chapter 557Economic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1004 / CH0639Equal Pay Commission - EstablishmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 639Economic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1005 / CH0437
    (SB0848 / CH0436)
Health Insurance - Contraceptive Equity ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 437Health and Government Operations
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorInsurance - Health (C3)
HB1006
    (SB0648)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital TomosynthesisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorInsurance - Health (C3)
HB1007 / CH0287Freedom to Vote ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Ways and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB1008 / CH0288Election Law - Early Voting CentersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 288Ways and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB1010Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning BoardVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Environment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1011Department of Transportation - Modal Administrations - AppointmentsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1012 / CH0289Tax Credit - Commuter Benefits - Eligibility and Credit AmountApproved by the Governor - Chapter 289Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1013 / CH0036
    (SB0908)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB1014 / CH0690
    (SB0676 / CH0689)
College Affordability Act of 2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 690Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1015 / CH0290Study of Student Loan Refinancing in MarylandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 290Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB1475Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings - Registration, Remediation, and TaxationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
Ways and Means
Co-SponsorMunicipal Corporations (L3)
HB1624 / CH0526
    (SB1104 / CH0525)
Transportation - Highways - Heroes HighwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Environment and Transportation
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceCo-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HJ0004
    (SJ0003)
United States Congress - Call to Congress and the President to Act on Redistricting ReformIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.