Contact Legislator(s)

Message will be sent to Michael E. Busch
Javascript must be enabled on your browser to use this feature. Click 'Close' to continue.

Delegate Michael E. Busch

2018 Regular Session

District 30A, Anne Arundel County

Total Bills: 19 (Primary Sponsor: 9, Co-sponsor: 10, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0092
    (SB0145)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Samaritan HouseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0093
    (SB0146)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Maryland Hall for the Creative ArtsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0094
    (SB0147)
Creation of a State Debt – Anne Arundel County – Light House Bistro and Culinary Training CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0095
    (SB0142)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Historic Annapolis MuseumIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0096 / CH0036Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Living Organ DonorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0106 / CH0186
    (SB0475 / CH0187)
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery VehiclesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 186Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPrimaryVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0360
    (SB0330)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Masonic Lodge No. 89In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0654
    (SB0264)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Maritime Museum and ParkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1804 / CH0590Health – Medical Research FundingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 590Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryOperating Budget (B1)
HB0001 / CH0004
    (SB0002 / CH0003)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB0155
    (SB0148)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence and Trafficking SheltersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0308 / CH0021
    (SB0646 / CH0015)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0365 / CH0574
    (SB0184 / CH0575)
Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - AlterationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0592
    (SB0327)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - The Bernie HouseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0819 / CH0253
    (SB0741)
Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – AppealsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0888
    (SB0707 / CH0252)
Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger ActivatorVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1662 / CH0237Business Regulation – Retail Pet StoresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 237Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1697
    (SB1122 / CH0357)
Education - Commercial Gaming Revenues - Constitutional AmendmentIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedAppropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1795 / CH0006Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 6Health and Government Operations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceCo-SponsorInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:56 P.M.