Delegate Norman H. Conway

2013 Regular Session

District 38B, Wicomico and Worcester Counties

Total Bills: 20 (Primary Sponsor: 9, Co-sponsor: 9, By Request: 2)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0408 / CH0258
    (SB0404 / CH0257)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management EquipmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0693Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety SeatsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0778 / CH0332
    (SB0899 / CH0331)
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 332Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB1163Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Wicomico County - Salisbury City ParkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1164
    (SB0773)
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Diakonia Housing ExpansionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1165
    (SB0941)
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - YMCA of the ChesapeakeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1179
    (SB0472)
Vehicle Laws - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer DecalsIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPrimaryVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1183 / CH0148Public Health - Retail Establishments - Use of Toilet Facilities by CustomersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 148Health and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPublic Health (J1)
HB1494 / CH0688
    (SB0876)
Correctional Services - Standards for Correctional Facilities - FundingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 688Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0262
    (SB0348)
Criminal Law - Distribution of Faked Controlled Dangerous Substance - Substantially Similar Chemical StructureIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0322
    (SB0222)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Yellow Dot ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0524
    (SB0643)
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
RulesCo-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0548
    (SB0090 / CH0180)
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Maximum TaxIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0685
    (SB0633 / CH0512)
Libraries - County Library Capital Project Grant - Wealth-Based Cost ShareIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0812Hunting - Certificate of Competency and Safety - Veterans and Active Duty MilitaryIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1119 / CH0317
    (SB0752 / CH0316)
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Appropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorSocial Services - Generally (O1)
HB1190 / CH0405County Property Tax - Personal Property RateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 405Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1534 / CH0342
    (SB1064 / CH0341)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Solar Water Heating SystemsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Economic MattersFinance
4/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0226 / CH0003
    (SB0275)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3Economic Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
HB0560 / CH0005
    (SB0538)
Public-Private PartnershipsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:45 A.M.