Former Delegate Jean B. Cryor

District 15


Delegate Jean B. Cryor
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 11, 1995 to January 10, 2007, representing District 15, Montgomery County
Party Affiliation
Republican
Past House Service
1995-2007
Ways and Means Committee
2004-2007
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
2005-2007
Legislative Policy Committee
2003-2007
Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive and Legislative Review
1999-2007
Joint Committee on Federal Relations
2003-2004
Special Committee on Higher Education Affordability and Accessibility
Biographical Information
Born in Lansdowne, Delaware County, Pennsylvania, December 13, 1938
University of Pennsylvania
Loyola College, M.B.A. 1979
Widow, three children, three grandchildren
Died in Potomac, Maryland, November 3, 2009

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.