Former Delegate Cornell N. Dypski

District 46


Delegate Cornell N. Dypski
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 14, 1987 to January 8, 2003, representing District 46, Baltimore City and Baltimore County Member of the Senate 1975 to 1983, representing District 47, Baltimore City
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
1995-2003
Commerce and Government Matters Committee
1990-1994
Judiciary Committee
Past Senate Service
1975-1983
Constitutional and Public Law Committee
Biographical Information
Born in Baltimore, Maryland, September 23, 1931
University of Baltimore
Married, one son
Died in Hunt Valley, Maryland, January 20, 2009

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.