Delegate Mark N. Fisher

2014 Regular Session

District 27B, Calvert County

Total Bills: 43 (Primary Sponsor: 8, Co-sponsor: 35, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0525Estate Tax - Qualified Agricultural Property - Repeal of Recapture ProvisionsIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0531Higher Education - Community Colleges - Bachelor's Degree ProgramsIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryHigher Education (F2)
HB0573Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0576Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Diminution in Value of Real Property - Compensation In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryEnvironment (M3)
HB1037Calvert County - Zoning - Target RangesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1129Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1343
    (SB0969)
Department of Veterans Affairs - Opioids Time Lock Dispenser Pilot ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1348State Government - Advertisements - Paid for by Maryland TaxpayersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0050
    (SB0464)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB0148Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' DayIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0184Estate and Inheritance Taxes - RepealIn the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0186Estate Tax - Recoupling With Federal LawIn the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0235Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional OfficersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0277Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0326Income Tax Relief Act of 2014In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0331
    (SB0280)
Electricity - Smart Meters - Disclosure of Usage DataIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0332Electricity - Consumer Relations - Smart MetersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0396 / CH0503
    (SB0446 / CH0502)
Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher EducationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 503Appropriations
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0448
    (SB0769)
Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage PenaltyIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0521Firearms - Handgun Permit Requirements - Handgun Qualification License HoldersIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0522Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - Inflation AdjustmentIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0528Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Inflation AdjustmentIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0551Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0557Taxpayer Protection Act - State Income Tax - Consumer Price Index AdjustmentsIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0558Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income (Fairness in Taxation for Retirees Act)In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0575
    (SB0221 / CH0146)
Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized UseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0635Health Care Malpractice - Expression of Regret or Apology - InadmissibilityIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0659
    (SB0974)
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Transport Through StateIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0666
    (SB0640)
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting MotorcyclesIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0698Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0699 / CH0419Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster ParentsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0713Public Safety - Handgun Safety Devices - External Safety LocksIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0715
    (SB0584)
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - RepealIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0720Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Training RequirementIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0754Dedicated State Funds Protection ActIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorOperating Budget (B1)
HB0893Education - Local School System AutonomyIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0915
    (SB0740)
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment CommissionIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0995Firearms Freedom ActIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1023State Lottery - Proceeds - Parks and Recreation DepartmentsIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1297Calvert County and St. Mary's County - Task Force to Study the Use and Trade of Illicit Opioids in Traditionally Rural CountiesIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB1361Joint Committee to Review the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange and Audit by the Office of Legislative AuditsIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 12:30 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorInsurance - Health (C3)
HJ0006
    (SJ0004)
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - DredgingIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HJ0009
    (SJ0009)
General Assembly Compensation Commission - RecommendationsIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 10, 2014 7:22 P.M.