Delegate Mark N. Fisher

2016 Regular Session

District 27C, Calvert County

Total Bills: 33 (Primary Sponsor: 7, Co-sponsor: 16, By Request: 10)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0434Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0572Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0586Retire in Maryland Act of 2016In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0613Public Utilities - Telephone Companies - Wired Broadband (Wired Broadband Act of 2016)In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0950Labor and Employment - Number of Employees Granted H-1B or L-1 Visa - DisclosureIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0966Higher Education - College of Southern Maryland - Bachelor's Degree ProgramsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryHigher Education (F2)
HB1415Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - EnforcementIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0217 / CH0255Open Meetings Act - Requirements for AgendasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 255Health and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0349 / CH0717
    (SB1162)
Baltimore County - Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 717Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0424Income Tax - Expensing of Business Property and Bonus DepreciationIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0425Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates - Vehicle Manufactured Without Means to Display Front PlateIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0559Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - ExceptionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0638General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Farmers' DayIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0660General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Equestrian DayIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0729Taxation - Prohibition on Exemptions and Credits for Organizations Having Known Ties to Terrorism (Homegrown Terrorism Prevention Act)In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0745 / CH0115
    (SB0435)
Business Regulation - State and Harford County Juke Box Licenses - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Economic Matters
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0785
    (SB0233 / CH0542)
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - TrainingVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0836Educational Institutions - Notice of Criminal Activity and Threats to SafetyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Co-SponsorEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0847Criminal Procedure - Crime of Violence - DefinitionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1038Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1054 / CH0642Income Tax - Penalties - Assessment ScheduleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 642Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1326Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Application ReportIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1624 / CH0526
    (SB1104 / CH0525)
Transportation - Highways - Heroes HighwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Environment and Transportation
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceCo-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0449
    (SB0375)
Relief From Budget MandatesIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0455
    (SB0387)
Income Tax Exemption Amount - Elderly IndividualsIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0456
    (SB0382)
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - RevisionsIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPublic Health (J1)
HB0457
    (SB0385)
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0458
    (SB0380)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0459 / CH0316
    (SB0389)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0460
    (SB0381 / CH0146)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Administration - Student and Residential Mortgage LoansVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
By Request - AdministrationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0461
    (SB0388)
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and FundingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0462 / CH0010
    (SB0383)
Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of FundsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0464
    (SB0376 / CH0144)
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Schools Act of 2016In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.