Delegate Mark N. Fisher

2017 Regular Session

District 27C, Calvert County

Total Bills: 28 (Primary Sponsor: 7, Co-sponsor: 19, By Request: 2)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB1238Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal PropertyIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1306Cable Service - Broadband Connection Requirement - EnforcementIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1313Public Utilities - Telephone Companies - Wired Broadband (Wired Broadband Act of 2017)In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1366Labor and Employment - Number of Employees Granted H-1B or L-1 Visa - DisclosureIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1367Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1426Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1444Retire in Maryland Act of 2017In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0196Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Interest Paid on Student LoansIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0440
    (SB0055)
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - ImmunityIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0531Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0536Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring, Work Zone Speed Control, and Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0598Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - ProhibitionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0714
    (SB0656)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0771 / CH0216
    (SB0262 / CH0215)
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health DepartmentsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 216Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0796
    (SB0748)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Girl Scouts and Boy ScoutsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0820Handgun Permits - Universal RecognitionIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0821Firearms - Permit to Wear, Carry, or Transport a Handgun - Expiration and RenewalIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0827Public Safety - Secretary of State Police - Temporary Firearms Training WaiverIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0911Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0949
    (SB0739)
Procurement and Pensions - State Sanctions - Discriminatory Boycott of IsraelIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Co-SponsorState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1036Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary ApprovalIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1230Gaming - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal OrganizationsIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorGaming (C7)
HB1246 / CH0746Forests and Parks - Public Recreation on Private and State-Owned Land - HuntingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 746Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1400
    (SB1098)
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service AgreementsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1406Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required ReportsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1419Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and InstallationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0687
    (SB0539 / CH0569)
Criminal Law - Distribution of Opioids Resulting in DeathIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0748
    (SB0540)
State Retirement Choice for the 21st Century WorkforceIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Pensions and Retirement (K4)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:19 P.M.