Delegate Robert L. Flanagan

2015 Regular Session

District 9B, Howard County

Total Bills: 33 (Primary Sponsor: 4, Co-sponsor: 19, By Request: 10)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0284 / CH0082Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment SummaryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 82Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryElections (G1)
HB0427Voters' Legislative Districting Panel - EstablishmentIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryElections (G1)
HB0428Voters' Congressional Districting Panel - EstablishmentIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryElections (G1)
HB0785
    (SB0666 / CH0376)
Recreational Fishing Licenses - Duration and Expiration DateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimaryHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0170
    (SB0088 / CH0148)
Natural Resources - Game Birds - BaitingVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0172
    (SB0778)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0194
    (SB0044 / CH0320)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on HighwaysVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0250Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Elderly or Disabled IndividualsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0305Administrative Procedure Act - Limitation on Adoption of RegulationsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0323 / CH0239
    (SB0262)
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Energy CodesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 239Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0361Criminal Procedure - Government-Funded Legal Representation - Initial AppearanceIn the House - First Reading JudiciaryJudiciaryCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0547Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0559University System of Maryland - Law School Clinics - Prohibited ActivitiesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0610Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0743Handgun Permits - Firearms Training Course - Renewal ApplicationIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0834Junior Advancement via Association Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0850
    (SB0448)
Congressional Districts - Standards and ProcessIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0870Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Elderly or Disabled IndividualsIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0874
    (SB0042)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB1008Recreational Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Voter RegistrationIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB1022
    (SB0609)
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - EstablishmentIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1200
    (SB0806)
State Board of Education - High School Assessment - GovernmentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1272Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of ReportIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorEthics (G2)
HB0480
    (SB0590)
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0481
    (SB0588)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
HB0482
    (SB0592 / CH0125)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0483
    (SB0589)
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - RepealIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0484
    (SB0591)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased RestorationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0485 / CH0312
    (SB0593)
Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax CheckoffApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - AdministrationElections (G1)
HB0486
    (SB0595 / CH0311)
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0487Maryland Education CreditIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0488
    (SB0594)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0156
    (SB0133 / CH0153)
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of FundsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeEnvironment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.