Delegate Tawanna P. Gaines

2015 Regular Session

District 22, Prince George's County

Total Bills: 36 (Primary Sponsor: 1, Co-sponsor: 34, By Request: 1)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0265
    (SB0352)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Greenbelt Lake Dam RepairIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 12:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0153Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Leaving Dogs Outside and Unattended in Extreme WeatherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0321
    (SB0159)
Funeral Establishments - Pre-Need Contracts - Reporting and Audit RequirementsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0340 / CH0241
    (SB0889)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall DayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0377
    (SB0373)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Revisions (Maryland Clean Energy Advancement Act of 2015)In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0381
    (SB0257)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management ToolIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAgriculture (M4)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0389
    (SB0455)
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor DayIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0503
    (SB0078)
Rape Survivor Family Protection ActIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB0536
    (SB0345)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management EquipmentIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0541 / CH0431Public Service Commission - Attachments to Utility Poles - StudyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 431Economic Matters
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0553
    (SB0585)
Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby FundIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0575
    (SB0524)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB0602
    (SB0320 / CH0024)
University of Maryland School of Medicine - Workgroup to Study Issues Related to Uterine FibroidsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0636
    (SB0154)
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Thermal EnergyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0663
    (SB0179)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0668Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Attorney's FeesIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0678
    (SB0478)
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact StatementsIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0682Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Referendum and Signatures Required for PetitionsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorMunicipal Corporations (L3)
HB0693Public Health - Cottage Food Businesses - RevisionsIn the House - First Reading Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government OperationsCo-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0701
    (SB0463)
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial DrugsIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAgriculture (M4)
HB0729 / CH0452
    (SB0160)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Cease and Desist Orders and Injunctive Relief - AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 452Health and Government Operations
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0749
    (SB0817)
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Policies - ReportingIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0753
    (SB0905 / CH0486)
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax CreditIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0823
    (SB0156)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Establishment of a Sickle Cell Disease Outreach ProgramIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0838 / CH0483
    (SB0416 / CH0482)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility ServicesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0923
    (SB0490 / CH0355)
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable ClassroomsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorCapital Budget (B5)
HB0949
    (SB0471)
Task Force to Study the Provision of Health Care Coverage to Uninsured MarylandersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0992
    (SB0672)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management ProgramIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1051
    (SB0424)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1080 / CH0116
    (SB0576)
9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Multiple-Line Telephone Systems - Direct Dial (Kari's Law)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1094Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required NoticeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1105
    (SB0761 / CH0382)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorDisabled (O3)
HJ0002
    (SJ0002)
United States Constitution - Democracy AmendmentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCo-SponsorElections (G1)
HJ0008
    (SJ0003)
Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War IIIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0405
    (SB0374 / CH0165)
Maryland False Claims ActVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.