Former Senator Joseph M. Getty

District 5


Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 3, Co-sponsor: 5, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0003State Minimum Wage Rate - Exceptions - Social Service Nonprofit OrganizationsIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceFinancePrimaryPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0008Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - RevisionsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinancePrimaryPublic Health (J1)
SB0081Carroll County - Property Tax Credit - Buc's Pleasure ClubIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and TaxationPrimaryTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0044 / CH0320
    (HB0194)
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on HighwaysApproved by the Governor - Chapter 320Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0096
    (HB0880)
Election Law - Early Voting Centers - ParkingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
SB0100
    (HB0767)
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - QualificationsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
SB0115
    (HB0099)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Correctional Officer, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes)In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SJ0001Susquehanna River Basin - Sediment and Nutrient Pollution (National Chesapeake Bay Preservation Act of 2015)In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 15, 2015 12:09 P.M.