Former Senator Jr. Giannetti, John A.

District 21


Senator Jr. Giannetti, John A.
TenureMember of the Senate January 8, 2003 to January 10, 2007, representing District 21, Anne Arundel and Prince George's Counties Member of the House of Delegates January 13, 1999 to January 8, 2003, representing District 13B, Howard and Prince George's Counties
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past Senate Service
2003-2007
Judicial Proceedings Committee
2003-2007
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
2003-2007
Joint Committee on Federal Relations
2003-2007
Joint Advisory Committee on Legislative Data Systems
2003-2007
Joint Technology Oversight Committee
Past House Service
1999-2003
Judiciary Committee
Biographical Information
Born at Camp Lejeune, North Carolina, June 9, 1964
Bucknell University, B.S. Biology 1986
University of Maryland School of Law, J.D. 1994
Admitted to Maryland Bar 1995
Admitted to District of Columbia Bar 2002

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.