Former Senator Lisa A. Gladden

District 41


Senator Lisa A. Gladden
TenureMember of the House of Delegates from January 13, 1999 to January 8, 2003. Member of the Maryland Senate from January 8, 2003 to January 11, 2017. Resigned January 11, 2017.
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past Senate Service
2016-2017, 2003-2006
Finance Committee
2007-2016
Majority Whip
2007-2016
Vice Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
2003-2017
Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive and Legislative Review (AELR)
2011-2014
Senate Chair, Joint Committee on Welfare Reform (Member, 2003-)
2013
Special Joint Commission on Public Safety and Security in State and Local Correctional Facilities
2009-2011
Joint Information Technology and Biotechnology Committee
2007-2011
Legislative Policy Committee
2007-2009
Joint Technology Oversight Committee
2003-2006
Assistant Deputy Majority Whip
2012
Task Force to Study Court Decision Regarding Pit Bulls
Past House Service
1999-2003
Judiciary Committee
1999-2003
Criminal Justice Subcommittee of the Judiciary Committee
Public Service
2015-
Maryland Correctional Enterprises Management Council
2011
Lead Poisoning Prevention Study Group
2008-2011
Maryland Access to Justice Commission
2008-
Pimlico Community Development Authority
2008-
Human Services and Public Safety Committee, Southern Legislative Conference
2007-2008
Truancy Court Work Group
2007-2008
Parliamentarian, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
2004-2008
Delegate, Democratic Party National Convention
2007-2016
State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy
2006-2007
Co-Chair, Task Force on Minority Participation in the Environmental Community
2006-
Baltimore City Democratic Central Committee
2006, 2001-2003
Co-Chair, Legislative Committee, Women Legislators of Maryland
2006, 2001-2003
Endorsement Committee, Women Legislators of Maryland
2002-2006
Drug Treatment Court Commission
2005
Co-Chair, Auto Insurance Task Force to Study Rates in Urban Areas
2004-2005
Task Force on Lending Equity within Financial Institutions Providing State Depository Services
2004-
Maryland State Council for Interstate Adult Offender Supervision
2004
Senate Special Commission on Medical Malpractice Liability Insurance
2001-2004
Advisory Council on Offender Employment Coordination
2001-2003
Drug Treatment Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
2000-2003
Chair, Judicial Nominating Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
2000-2003
Vice Chair, Membership Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
1999-2003
Liaison Workgroup, Baltimore City Delegation
1999-2001
State Council on Child Abuse and Neglect
2000
Toll Fellow, Council of State Governments
Memberships
1995-
Vice Chair, Children and the Law Committee, American Bar Association
1994-1995
President, Alliance of Black Women Attorneys
1991-
Maryland Bar Association
American Bar Association
Bar Association of Baltimore City
Women's International Bowling Congress
1999-2017
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
1999-2017
Women Legislators of Maryland
Awards
2000
Legislator Recognition Award, Maryland Association of Counties
Biographical Information
Born, Baltimore, Maryland, October 6, 1964
Western High School, 1982
Duke University, B.A., History, with honors, 1986
University of Maryland School of Law, J.D., 1991
Law Clerk to Judge Mabel E. H. Hubbard, Baltimore City Circuit Court, 1991-1993
Assistant Public Defender, Office of Public Defender, Baltimore City, 1993-
Former Financial Consultant, Merrill Lynch
Member, First Baptist Church of Baltimore (Sunday School Teacher, Gospel Choir)
Single

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.