Former Delegate Michael Robert Gordon

District 17


Delegate Michael Robert Gordon
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 12, 1983 to January 10, 2007, representing District 17, Montgomery County
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
2003-2007, 1989-1994
Ways and Means Committee
1995-2003
Economic Matters Committee
1983-1989
Constitutional and Administrative Law Committee
1990-2007
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
2003-2007
Spending Affordability Committee (House Chair)
1993-1994
Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review
1986-1991
Chair, Montgomery County Delegation
Biographical Information
Born in Silver Spring, Maryland, July 5, 1947
Towson State College, B.A. 1969 (ROTC)
Georgetown University Law Center, J.D. 1972
Admitted to Maryland State and Supreme Court Bars
U.S. Army Reserve, Captain 1972-1980
Married
Died in Bethesda, Maryland, August 29, 2012

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.