Delegate Robin L. Grammer, Jr.

2015 Regular Session

District 6, Baltimore County

Total Bills: 34 (Primary Sponsor: 2, Co-sponsor: 24, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0306Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
PrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0834Junior Advancement via Association Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0009 / CH0393
    (SB0105)
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 393Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0174Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0214Maryland Transportation Authority - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Toll Discount PlansIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0241
    (SB0904)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - PenaltyIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0251Corporate Income Tax - Rate ReductionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0302
    (SB0028)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0406Education - Implementation of the Common Core State Standards - ProhibitionIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0432Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Applicant QualificationsIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0436
    (SB0266)
Education - Privacy of Education Records and Personal Information of StudentsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0454
    (SB0664)
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0464
    (SB0454)
Handgun Permits - ReciprocityIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0466 / CH0053
    (SB0802 / CH0052)
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0639
    (SB0377)
Maryland Transportation Authority - MembershipIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0743Handgun Permits - Firearms Training Course - Renewal ApplicationIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0767
    (SB0100)
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - QualificationsIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0842Public Safety - Honorably Discharged Veterans - Handgun PermitsIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0875
    (SB0665)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College TextbooksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0917 / CH0287
    (SB0716)
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting MotorcyclesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0918
    (SB0727)
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - TrainingIn the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0961
    (SB0511)
Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health ActIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0996
    (SB0375)
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - RepealIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1024Public Safety - Renewal of Handgun Permits - FingerprintingIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1085
    (SB0376)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll ExpensesIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1105
    (SB0761 / CH0382)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorDisabled (O3)
HB0480
    (SB0590)
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0481
    (SB0588)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
HB0482
    (SB0592 / CH0125)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0483
    (SB0589)
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - RepealIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0484
    (SB0591)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased RestorationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0486
    (SB0595 / CH0311)
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0487Maryland Education CreditIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0488
    (SB0594)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.