Delegate Melony G. Griffith

2014 Regular Session

District 25, Prince George's County

Total Bills: 29 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 26, By Request: 3)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0148Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' DayIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0358
    (SB0270)
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking OffensesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0443
    (SB0589)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0469Speed Monitoring Systems - School Zones - Days of OperationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0480 / CH0301
    (SB0508 / CH0300)
Office of the Attorney General - Establishment of a Consumer Affairs Satellite Office in Prince George's CountyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 301Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0543
    (SB0594)
Hepatitis C - Opportunity for Testing and Follow-Up Health CareIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0562Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference ExpensesIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0569Campaign Finance - Cash Contributions - LimitIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0577
    (SB1018)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Continuation, Membership, Stipend, and DutiesIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorChildren (O4)
HB0595 / CH0233Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial InstitutionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Co-SponsorReal Property (N1)
HB0663
    (SB1076)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Olde Mill Community and Teaching CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 5:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0740 / CH0535
    (SB0603 / CH0534)
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment FundApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0741 / CH0533
    (SB0601 / CH0532)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0742 / CH0531
    (SB0600 / CH0530)
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 531Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0743 / CH0537
    (SB0604 / CH0536)
Income Tax Forms - Graphical Representation of General Fund ExpendituresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 537Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0856 / CH0259
    (SB1065)
Workgroup on Workforce Development for Community Health WorkersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0917Maryland Aviation Administration - Contract Authority - Transportation CompaniesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0958
    (SB0411)
Rape Survivor Family Protection ActIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB1036
    (SB0796 / CH0341)
Human Services - Interagency Council on HomelessnessIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceAppropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance Co-SponsorSocial Services - Generally (O1)
HB1066Maryland Transportation Authority Police - Collective Bargaining - Binding ArbitrationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1194
    (SB1039)
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - EvaluationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB1222 / CH0647Ruth M. Kirk Public Social Work ScholarshipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB1293Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Servers - RegistrationIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1323
    (SB0927)
Public School Construction - Creative Financing StudyIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsAppropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1337
    (SB0798)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HJ0008
    (SJ0008)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFinancial Institutions (I1)
HB0612
    (SB0575 / CH0304)
State Retirement and Pension System - Code Simplification and ClarificationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - OtherState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0630
    (SB0576 / CH0180)
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment of Retirees - Penalty for Failure to Submit CertificationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - OtherState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0739 / CH0612
    (SB0602)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation By Request - OtherTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.