Delegate Nina R. Harper

2013 Regular Session

District 45, Baltimore City

Total Bills: 7 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 7, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0128 / CH0026
    (SB0158 / CH0025)
Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility Verification and ApplicationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 26Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0408 / CH0258
    (SB0404 / CH0257)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management EquipmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0644 / CH0507
    (SB0613 / CH0506)
Income Tax - Electronic Filing - Designation to Purchase Federal Savings BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 507Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0817Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Stations - Alternate Power SourcesIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1017 / CH0659Income Tax Credit - Wineries and VineyardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 659Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1161 / CH0671Commission on Special Education Access and EquityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 671Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1393 / CH0682Public Schools - Student Work Product - Claim of Copyright ProhibitedApproved by the Governor - Chapter 682Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.