Former Delegate Nina R. Harper

District 45


Delegate Nina R. Harper
TenureAppointed to the House of Delegates, replacing Hattie N. Harrison, deceased, January 28, 2013. Sworn in on February 27, 2013, served to January 14, 2015, representing District 45, Baltimore City.
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
2013-2015
Ways and Means Committee
2013-2015
Revenues Subcommittee of the Ways and Means Committee
2013-2015
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
2013-2015
Women Legislators of Maryland
Public Service
2007-2011, 2002-2006, 1994-1998
Baltimore City Democratic State Central Committee
Memberships
2009-
Bluford Drew Jemison Math and Technology Academy School Improvement Team
2003-2009
Board of Directors, St. Frances Academy High School
2005-
Johns Hopkins University - Center for Childhood Asthma Community Advisory Board
2005-
Vice President, East North Avenue Community Development Corporation
2000-2005
St. Francis Xavier Church Finance Council
2004-
Dr. Bernard Harris Elementary School Improvement Team
2001-2003
Belair Edison Community Association Board (Chair, Housing and Sanitation Committee)
2000-2003
Oliver Faith and Community Coalition Organizer
2000-2002
Chair, St. Alphonsus Catholic Elementary School Board, Baltimore, Maryland
1996-2002
Area Deputy - Baltimore/Washington, Knights of Peter Claver Ladies Auxiliary
2001-
Archdiocese of Baltimore, African American Catholic Ministries Board
2000-
Board of Directors, Dallas Street Community Development Corporation
1995-1999
National Alliance of Black Telecommunications Employees, Inc.
1996-1998
Vice President, Board of Directors, Belair Housing Services, Inc.
1996-1997
Chairperson of Advisory Committee, Community Health Assessment Program, Johns Hopkins Health Systems and Atlantic Health Association
1991-1996
Advisory Board Member, Mammography Screening Program, Johns Hopkins Oncology Center
1994-1995
YMCA of Greater Baltimore, AT&T Adult Mentoring Program
1994
Baltimore Neighborhoods Inc. - HUD's Fair Housing Initiative Program for Belair Edison Community
Awards
Numerous meritorious awards from churches and community organizations
Biographical Information
Born, Baltimore, Maryland, October 15, 1950
St. Frances Academy High School, Baltimore, Maryland
B.A., Business Management, Sojourner Douglass College, Baltimore, Maryland (cum laude)
Certified Mediator, State of New York, Community Mediation Program, Johns Hopkins University, 1995
Certified Housing Counselor, Neighbor Works Training Institute, Washington, D.C., April 2007
C&P Telephone Company (Bell Atlantic), 1968-82
Assistant Staff Manager, Human Resources, Vice President's Staff, AT&T, 1983-90
Project Manager and Account Executive, Global Services Division, AT&T, 1990-98
Director, Communication Services (Acting), 2000-01
Baltimore City Cable and Communications Commissioner, 2000-03
Consultant, Harper & Associates, 1999, 2002-04
Executive Director, Oliver Community Association and Oliver Economic Development Corp., 2004-
Mayor Sheila Dixon's Transition Team and Member of Blue Ribbon Committee, 2007
Co-Chair, Mayor Stephanie Rawlings-Blake Transition Team, 2010
Community Organizer
Notary Public
Divorced, One son

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.