Former Delegate Patrick N. Hogan

District 3A


Delegate Patrick N. Hogan
TenureFirst elected to the Maryland House of Delegates, 2002. Member of the House January 8, 2003 to January 10, 2007. Next elected to the House in 2010. Member of the House January 12, 2011 to January 14, 2015, representing District 3A, Frederick County.
Party Affiliation
Republican
Past House Service
2012-2013
Deputy Minority Whip
2011-2015, 2003-2007
Environmental Matters Committee
2011-2015, 2003-2007
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2011-2015
Agriculture, Agriculture Preservation, and Open Space Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2011-2015
Joint Committee on Program Open Space and Agricultural Land Preservation
2006-2007
Agriculture, Agriculture Preservation and Open Space Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2006-2007
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2005-2006
Natural Resources and Ethics Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2003-2006
Environment Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2004
Electronics Recycling Workgroup of the Environmental Matters Committee
2004
Co-Chair, Wetlands and Waterways Funding Workgroup of the Environmental Matters Committee
2003-2004
Ethics Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
Public Service
2011-2015
Maryland Dairy Industry Oversight and Advisory Council
2003-2007
Republican Legislators Committee
2004-2005
Task Force on Business-Owner Compensation in Condemnation Proceedings
2003-2004
Steering Committee, Frederick County Drug Treatment Court
Memberships
2004-2012
Board of Directors, Frederick County Friends of Catholic Education
2011-2015, 2006-2007
Maryland Veterans Caucus
2006-2011
Volunteer, Volunteer Frederick's Big Sweep
2007-
Rotary Club of Frederick
2003-2007
Maryland Rural Caucus
2003-2007
Maryland Legislative Sportsmen's Caucus
2005-
Board of Directors, St. John's Catholic Prep High School
2003
Board of Directors, Metropolitan Washington Council of Governments
2002-
University of Maryland Alumni Association
Biographical Information
Born, Silver Spring, Maryland, February 15, 1979
Gonzaga College High School, Washington, DC, 1997
University of Maryland, College Park, B.A., Government and Politics, 2002
Intern, Maryland State Senate, 2001
Marketing Coordinator, Amlex, Inc., 1999-2003
Associate, The Hogan Companies, 2003-2006
Director of Development, YMCA of Frederick, 2007-2011
Director of Business Development, The Hogan Companies, 2012-
Member, Saint Katharine Drexel Catholic Church, Frederick
Married, Three children

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.