Former Delegate Thomas E. (Tim) Hutchins

District 28


Delegate Thomas E. (Tim) Hutchins
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 11, 1995 to February 11, 2003, representing District 28, Charles County
Party Affiliation
Republican
Past House Service
1995-2003
Judiciary Committee
1995-2003
Special Committee on Drug and Alcohol Abuse
Biographical Information
Born in Baltimore, Maryland
Charles County Community College, A.A. 1975
University of Maryland University College, B.S. Law Enforcement 1981, M.G.A. State and Local Government 1997
Served in U.S. Army 1965-1967
Graduate, U.S. Army Sergeants Major Academy 1990
Command Sergeant Major, 29th Infantry Division Aviation Brigade, Maryland Army National Guard 1968-2004
Secretary of Veterans Affairs, March 21, 2003 to December 10, 2003
Secretary of State Police, April 26, 2004 to June 6, 2007

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.