Delegate Sally Jameson

2015 Regular Session

District 28, Charles County

Total Bills: 35 (Primary Sponsor: 13, Co-sponsor: 16, By Request: 6)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0237
    (SB0095)
Workers' Compensation - Children's Scholarship Fund - EstablishmentIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPrimaryWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB0358 / CH0088
    (SB0368)
Workers' Compensation Insurance - Cancellation and Nonrenewal - NoticeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 88Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0359
    (SB0280)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot ProgramIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryAgriculture (M4)
HB0468
    (SB0465 / CH0036)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance CompanyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB0469
    (SB0460 / CH0174)
Public Utilities - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission LinesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0472 / CH0250
    (SB0207)
Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Economic Matters
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePrimaryUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0630 / CH0444Mechanical Repair Contracts - RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 444Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0684Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Standards - DeductiblesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPrimaryInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0685
    (SB0435)
Homeowner's Insurance - Coverage for Loss Caused by Water DamageIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPrimaryInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0691Homeowner's Insurance - Notices to Policyholders - RequiredIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPrimaryInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0699
    (SB0434)
Commercial Insurance and Workers' Compensation Insurance - Notice of Premium IncreaseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPrimaryInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0700
    (SB0436)
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Prior Approval Rate Making - ExemptionsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPrimaryInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1253
    (SB0910 / CH0208)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - StudyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimaryInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0212Higher Education - College of Southern Maryland - Bachelor's Degree ProgramsIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0340 / CH0241
    (SB0889)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall DayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0553
    (SB0585)
Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby FundIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0569State Police Retirement System and Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Reemployment of RetireesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0651Personal Property Reports - Exemption and AffidavitIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansCo-SponsorTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0672 / CH0176
    (SB0496 / CH0175)
Maryland College Education Export Act of 2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176Appropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0714Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0721
    (SB0568)
Real Estate Appraisers - Appraisal Agreement - Required CopiesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0724
    (SB0569)
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of CoverageIn the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0786 / CH0103
    (SB0613)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0842Public Safety - Honorably Discharged Veterans - Handgun PermitsIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0920State Highway Administration - Relocation of Water and Sewer Lines - Payment of CostsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0992
    (SB0672)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management ProgramIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1021
    (SB0676)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer Death with Dignity ActIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB1051
    (SB0424)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1061
    (SB0300)
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A LicensesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0487Maryland Education CreditIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0939 / CH0137
    (SB0775)
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small BusinessesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
FinanceBy Request - OtherState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0940 / CH0138
    (SB0774)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceBy Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0941 / CH0139
    (SB0773)
Task Force to Study Exemptions from Higher Education Ethics Requirements and Procurement Rules to Facilitate Technology TransferApproved by the Governor - Chapter 139Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0942 / CH0140
    (SB0772)
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship MarylandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 140Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0943 / CH0141
    (SB0776)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - RestructuringApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceBy Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.