Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer

2015 Regular Session

District 12, Baltimore and Howard Counties

Total Bills: 34 (Primary Sponsor: 6, Co-sponsor: 23, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0033
    (HB1267)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Good Shepherd Boys Unit RenovationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0177
    (HB0828 / CH0104)
Estate Tax - Filing of Tax ReturnsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0178 / CH0018
    (HB0826)
Estate Tax - Alternative Payment Schedule - Penalty ProhibitionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 18Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0364 / CH0163
    (HB1121)
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to EmploymentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 163Budget and Taxation
3/6/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0862 / CH0389Maryland Park Service - Operations Revenue - Mandated AppropriationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 389Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0905 / CH0486
    (HB0753)
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax CreditEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0080 / CH0002
    (HB1118 / CH0001)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans DayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 2Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0193Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment SummaryVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
SB0271
    (HB0239)
Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference ExpensesIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
SB0365
    (HB0810)
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credit - Business IncubatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0367
    (HB0582)
Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0415 / CH0348
    (HB0592)
State Donor Registry - Information and Methods of Registration - Clerks of Circuit Courts, Registers of Wills, and Motor Vehicle Administration (Enhancing Organ Donation Rates Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB0433 / CH0349Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - DispositionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 349Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0455
    (HB0389)
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor DayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0488Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit AmountsIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0526
    (HB0244 / CH0313)
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2015In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0529
    (HB0595)
Special Elections for United States Senate Vacancies ActIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
SB0600 / CH0370Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - FundingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0601 / CH0371
    (HB0130)
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 371Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCapital Budget (B5)
SB0602 / CH0042
    (HB0388)
Justice Reinvestment Coordinating CouncilApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
SB0603
    (HB0622)
Correctional Services - Aging Prisoners - Conditional ParoleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
SB0604 / CH0043
    (HB0229)
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protection for InternsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHuman Relations (D5)
SB0605Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive DamagesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0607
    (HB0896 / CH0464)
Joint Committee on Behavioral Health and Opioid Use DisordersVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
SB0761 / CH0382
    (HB1105)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 382Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorDisabled (O3)
SB0763 / CH0050
    (HB1233)
Tax Amnesty ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0863 / CH0124Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 124Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
SB0910 / CH0208
    (HB1253)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Entry-Level Commercial Truck Driver's License Holders - StudyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 208Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0937Alcoholic Beverages - Powdered Alcoholic Beverages - Ban on SalesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCo-SponsorAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0772
    (HB0942 / CH0140)
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship MarylandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0773
    (HB0941 / CH0139)
Task Force to Study Exemptions from Higher Education Ethics Requirements and Procurement Rules to Facilitate Technology TransferIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0774
    (HB0940 / CH0138)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0775
    (HB0939 / CH0137)
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small BusinessesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0776
    (HB0943 / CH0141)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - RestructuringIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.