Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer

2016 Regular Session

District 12, Baltimore and Howard Counties

Total Bills: 31 (Primary Sponsor: 11, Co-sponsor: 19, By Request: 1)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0040
    (HB0621)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Environmental Education Center Renovation and Expansion Ho. Co. 2-16In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0115Property Tax Assessments - Inspection of PropertyIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0205
    (HB0328)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Good Shepherd SchoolIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0251
    (HB1609)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Arbutus Volunteer Fire DepartmentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0288 / CH0547
    (HB0484 / CH0548)
Income Tax - Corporation Returns - Filing DateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 547Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0422 / CH0671
    (HB0709 / CH0672)
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - FundingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0670
    (HB1090 / CH0130)
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community LicenseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrimaryAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0676 / CH0689
    (HB1014 / CH0690)
College Affordability Act of 2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
PrimaryTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0893
    (HB0643)
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Licenses Near Places of WorshipIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0894
    (HB1190)
Human Services - Weighted Caseload Analysis - StudyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnFinance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0982 / CH0459State Retirement and Pension System - Private Equity and Venture Capital InvestmentsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 459Budget and Taxation
3/10/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0150 / CH0530
    (HB0237 / CH0531)
Courts - Prohibition Against Testimony by Convicted Perjurer - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0171
    (HB1489)
Guardianship of a Minor or Disabled Person - Criminal History Records CheckIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB0179
    (HB0448)
Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0181
    (HB0531)
Maryland Strong Manufacturing Development ActIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0185 / CH0538
    (HB1333 / CH0539)
Income Tax - Filing of Withholding StatementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 538Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0263
    (HB1409)
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forests, State Parks, and Wildlife Management AreasIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedBudget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0271 / CH0665
    (HB0722 / CH0666)
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms - FundingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 665Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0286Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0295
    (HB1048)
Income Tax - Earned Income Credit - RefundabilityIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0317 / CH0063
    (HB1463)
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0322 / CH0667
    (HB0378 / CH0668)
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness CampaignEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 667Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0324 / CH0013
    (HB0309)
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 13Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0355
    (HB0431 / CH0039)
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - EstablishmentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorDisabled (O3)
SB0374 / CH0197
    (HB0335)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - College Savings Plans - ContributionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0481 / CH0556
    (HB1003 / CH0557)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkApproved by the Governor - Chapter 556Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCo-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0572
    (HB0569)
Baltimore County Board of Education - Appointments by Governor - Advice and Consent of the SenateIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB1007 / CH0323
    (HB1378 / CH0324)
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and TrustApproved by the Governor - Chapter 323Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic MattersCo-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1143 / CH0606Neshante and Chloe Davis Domestic Violence Prevention Task ForceApproved by the Governor - Chapter 606Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
JudiciaryCo-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
SJ0002
    (HJ0008)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
SB1104 / CH0525
    (HB1624 / CH0526)
Transportation - Highways - Heroes HighwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTransportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:08 P.M.