Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke

2018 Regular Session

District 31B, Anne Arundel County

Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke
Annapolis Address:212 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401

Phone: 410-841-3421 | 301-858-3421 | Toll-free in MD: 1-800-492-7122 ext. 3421
Fax: 410-841-3553 | 301-858-3553
Interim Address:212 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401

Phone: 410-841-3421 | 301-858-3421
Contact:Contact Online or send email to: nicholaus.kipke@house.state.md.us
Tenure:First elected to the Maryland House of Delegates, 2006. Member of the House January 10, 2007 to January 14 2015, representing District 31, Anne Arundel County. Representing District 31B, Anne Arundel County, beginning January 14, 2015.
Current Assignments:2013- Minority Leader
2013- Legislative Policy Committee
2014- House Committee on Rules and Executive Nominations
2007- Health and Government Operations Committee
2007- Insurance Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2017- Health Facilities and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2013- Spending Affordability Committee
Party Affiliation:Republican

December 8, 2017 11:17 A.M.
Past House Service
2013Chair, Anne Arundel County House Delegation
2011-2012Joint Committee on Base Realignment and Closure
2007-2011Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2011-2014Government Operations Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2015-2017Estates and Trusts Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2017Health Facilities and Occupations Subcommittee
2010-2015Joint Committee on Federal Relations
2015Joint Committee on the Selection of the State Treasurer
Public Service
2011-2015Maryland Health Care Reform Coordinating Council
2010-2011Maryland Communities for a Lifetime Commission
2009-2010Maryland Council for New Americans
2009-2010Workgroup on Clean and Healthy Waterways, Anne Arundel County Delegation
2008-2009Statewide Empowerment Zones for Seniors Commission
2008-2009Chair, Workgroup on Correctional Facilities Residential Drug Treatment
2005-2007Drug and Alcohol Abuse Council, Anne Arundel County
Memberships
2003-2012Autism Awareness Advocate
2005-2008Volunteer, Habitat for Humanity
2005-2006Vice Chair, Maryland Interfaith Recover Coalition
Boulevard Park Improvement Association
North County Republican Club
Life Member, National Rifle Association
Public Policy Dispute Resolution Fellow
Biographical Information
Born, Baltimore, Maryland, January 26, 1979
Chesapeake High School
Anne Arundel Community College
Restaurant Manager, FriendCo Restaurants, 1995-2000
Manufacturer Representative, REPS & Associates, Inc., 2000-Present
Chair, Church Council, Our Lady of the Chesapeake Catholic Church, 2001-02
Married. Two children.

December 8, 2017 11:17 A.M.