Delegate Tony Knotts

2015 Regular Session

District 26, Prince George's County

Total Bills: 22 (Primary Sponsor: 7, Co-sponsor: 15, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0840Real Property - Foreclosure - Prohibition on Deficiency JudgmentIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryReal Property (N1)
HB0855Law Enforcement Explorer Program - FundingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB1176Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Standardbred Owners and Trainers - Benefit ProgramsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
PrimaryHorse Racing (C6)
HB1183 / CH0472
    (SB0649)
Real Property - Contract for Sale of New HomeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 472Environment and TransportationJudicial ProceedingsPrimaryReal Property (N1)
HB1184
    (SB0835)
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryReal Property (N1)
HB1216
    (SB0648)
Task Force to Study the Effect of the Drug Ritalin on School ChildrenIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimaryPublic Health (J1)
HB1225
    (SB0897)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Crossland High SchoolIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0197 / CH0406
    (SB0295)
Prince George's County - Education - Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 406Ways and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0198
    (SB0294)
Education - Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansCo-SponsorEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0215
    (SB0183 / CH0477)
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - RequirementIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0300 / CH0238Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization StudyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 238Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0340 / CH0241
    (SB0889)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall DayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0357Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young ChildIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0466 / CH0053
    (SB0802 / CH0052)
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0605
    (SB0163)
Agriculture - Neonicotinoid Pesticide - Labeling Requirement (Pollinator Protection Act of 2015)In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAgriculture (M4)
HB0694 / CH0268
    (SB0286)
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Division of Parole and Probation - Warrant Apprehension Unit Employees - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2015 - 8:30 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0718State Personnel - Innovative Idea Awards Program - Additional Cash AwardsIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0970
    (SB0689 / CH0047)
Prince George's County - Transfer Tax - Deputy SheriffsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1059
    (SB0686)
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1195
    (SB0877)
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorReal Property (N1)
HB1272Lobbying - Legislative Unit Meals and Receptions - Publication of ReportIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorEthics (G2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.