Delegate Carol L. Krimm

2015 Regular Session

District 3A, Frederick County

Total Bills: 38 (Primary Sponsor: 4, Co-sponsor: 34, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0289
    (SB0039)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Culler Lake Stormwater Management ProjectIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0326Environment - Monocacy River Watershed - Water Resources PlanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryEnvironment (M3)
HB0690Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Maryland Municipalities)In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1161 / CH0388Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as EducatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388Health and Government Operations
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePrimaryDisabled (O3)
HB0056
    (SB0152)
Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - ProhibitionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0057
    (SB0237)
University System of Maryland - Pay It Forward Pilot Program and Tuition Freeze - StudiesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0185
    (SB0667)
Real-Time Transparency Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0197 / CH0406
    (SB0295)
Prince George's County - Education - Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 406Ways and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0198
    (SB0294)
Education - Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansCo-SponsorEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0211Task Force to Study Pay It ForwardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0216 / CH0409
    (SB0200)
Environment - Personal Care Products Containing Synthetic Plastic Microbeads - Prohibition on Manufacturing or SaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB0218Election Law - Days of Early VotingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0219Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and ReportingIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0226
    (SB0311)
Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public CommunicationsIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0300 / CH0238Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization StudyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 238Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0340 / CH0241
    (SB0889)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall DayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0376Electric Companies - Vegetation Management - Local Law, Rule, or RegulationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0382 / CH0244Sexual Assault Survivors' Right to Know ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 244Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0394
    (SB0024)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Weinberg Center HVAC ProjectIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0452 / CH0421
    (SB0497)
Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public SchoolsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0466 / CH0053
    (SB0802 / CH0052)
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0578
    (SB0514)
Higher Education - Net Price Calculator Improvement Act - EstablishmentIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0584
    (SB0283)
Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of a Municipal Corporation - Confidential InformationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEthics (G2)
HB0595
    (SB0529)
Special Elections for United States Senate Vacancies ActIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0604
    (SB0166)
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0612Criminal Law - Stalking - Included ActsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0642
    (SB0508 / CH0180)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0665
    (SB0675)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 (BSL-3) Laboratory Safety ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0667Higher Education Institutions - Sexual Assault, Violence, and Stalking - Prevention and Outreach PoliciesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0718State Personnel - Innovative Idea Awards Program - Additional Cash AwardsIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0730Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0749
    (SB0817)
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Policies - ReportingIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0919 / CH0288
    (SB0551)
Land Use - Plans - Development and AdoptionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 288Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB0965 / CH0291
    (SB0334)
The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0992
    (SB0672)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management ProgramIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1083
    (SB0550)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB1105
    (SB0761 / CH0382)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorDisabled (O3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.