Former Senator Gloria G. Lawlah

District 26


Senator Gloria G. Lawlah
TenureMember of the Senate January 9, 1991 to January 10, 2007, representing District 26, Prince George's County Member of the House of Delegates January 14, 1987 to January 9, 1991, representing District 26, Prince George's County
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past Senate Service
1995-2007
Budget and Taxation Committee
1995-2000
Executive Nominations Committee
1991-1994
Economic and Environmental Affairs Committee
2001-2003
Legislative Policy Committee
1997-2000
Spending Affordability Committee
2003-2007
Joint Committee on Protocol
1998-2007
Joint Audit Committee
1998-2007
Joint Committee on Health Care Delivery and Financing
1991-2007
Joint Committee on Investigation
1996, 2003
Joint Committee on the Selection of the State Treasurer
2004-2007
Chair, Prince George's County Delegation
Past House Service
1987-1991
Constitutional and Administrative Law Committee
1987-1991
Joint Committee on Federal Relations
Biographical Information
Born in Newberry, South Carolina, March 12, 1939
Hampton University, B.S. Social Studies 1960
Trinity College, M.A. English and Administration 1970
Maryland Secretary of Aging
Married, three children, six grandchildren

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.