Delegate Jazz Lewis

2017 Regular Session

District 24, Prince George's County

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 3, Co-sponsor: 2, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB1525
    (SB1025)
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National StandardsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPrimaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1564
    (SB0659)
Task Force on Practices and Procedures on Solitary ConfinementIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB1633
    (SB1162)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Capitol Heights Municipal Multiservice CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0001
    (SB0230)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
2/10/2017 - 12:30 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1422
    (SB0296)
Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust FundIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)

November 28, 2017 1:20 P.M.