Delegate James E. Malone, Jr.

2013 Regular Session

District 12A, Baltimore and Howard Counties

Total Bills: 34 (Primary Sponsor: 11, Co-sponsor: 20, By Request: 3)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0374
    (SB0212 / CH0206)
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with DisabilitiesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPrimaryVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0753 / CH0637
    (SB0339 / CH0638)
Motor Vehicles - Use of Wireless Communication Device - Prohibited Acts, Enforcement, and PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 637Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPrimaryVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0759Vehicle Laws - Distracted Driving - ProhibitionIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0769 / CH0537
    (SB0750 / CH0536)
Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Local Wind Design and Wind-Borne Debris StandardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 537Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0836 / CH0065
    (SB0600 / CH0064)
Vehicle Laws - Electric VehiclesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 65Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPrimaryVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0889
    (SB0621 / CH0066)
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and EscortsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPrimaryVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0929Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local JurisdictionsIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report AdoptedEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPrimaryVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1041
    (SB0909)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Comet Booster Club Concession StandIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1346Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits on HighwaysIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1413 / CH0595
    (SB0969 / CH0594)
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke AlarmsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 595Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB1439
    (SB0924)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Catonsville Clubhouse RenovationsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0205
    (SB0100)
Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0248
    (SB0291)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Baltimore County Humane SocietyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0293State Finance and Procurement - Retention of Percentage of Contract - SecurityVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0380 / CH0617Income Tax - Joint Returns - Married CouplesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 617Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0408 / CH0258
    (SB0404 / CH0257)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management EquipmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0415
    (SB0187)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Community College of Baltimore County Catonsville Historic Mansion PreservationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0417
    (SB0186)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Good Shepherd Center Cooling TowerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0418
    (SB0099)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Little Sisters of the Poor - St. Martin's HomeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0625
    (SB0614)
Environment - Dental Radiation Machines - Maintenance and InspectionsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB0667 / CH0262
    (SB0422 / CH0261)
Public School Employees - Collective Bargaining - Representation FeesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0713 / CH0636Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human TraffickingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0756
    (SB0860)
State Birds - Oriole and RavenIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0778 / CH0332
    (SB0899 / CH0331)
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 332Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0791 / CH0389
    (SB0728)
Tax Credits - Electric Vehicles - ExtensionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 389Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0877 / CH0555
    (SB0811 / CH0554)
Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt RegulationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 555Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0987Punitive Damages - High-Risk Drunk DriversIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1101 / CH0403Medical Marijuana - Academic Medical Centers - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana CommissionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403Health and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB1174Educator Evaluation System - Pilot Program ExtensionIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1255Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - LicensingIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1411
    (SB0996)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Maryland Food Bank ImprovementsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - AdministrationBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0863
    (SB0841 / CH0428)
Higher Education Fair Share ActVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0767 / CH0562
    (SB0820 / CH0561)
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - EstablishmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 562Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherAgriculture (M4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.