Former Delegate Kenneth H. Masters

District 12


Delegate Kenneth H. Masters
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 10, 1979 to January 11, 1995, representing District 13 (1979-1982) and District 12 (1982-1995), Baltimore County
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
1993-1995
Majority Leader
1979-1995
Judiciary Committee
1991-1995
Legislative Policy Committee
1991-1993
Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive and Legislative Review (House Chair)
Biographical Information
Born in Washington, D.C., August 16, 1943
Towson State College, B.A. 1965
University of Maryland School of Law, J.D. 1972
Admitted to Maryland Bar 1972
Served in U.S. Army 1966-1969 (Platoon Leader, Vietnam 1968-1969)
Married, two children, one grandson
Died in Baltimore, Maryland, January 17, 2012

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.