Former Delegate Brian K. McHale

District 46


Delegate Brian K. McHale
TenureFirst elected to the Maryland House of Delegates, November 6, 1990. Member of the House, February 5, 1990 (appointed) to January 14, 2015, representing District 46, Baltimore City:
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
1999-2015
Economic Matters Committee
2007-2015
Chair, Public Utilities Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee (Member, 2003)
2011-2015
Alcoholic Beverages Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2006-2015
House Chair, Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
2007-2015
House Chair, Joint Committee on Investigation
2007-2010
Unemployment Insurance Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2005-2010
Property and Casualty Insurance Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2009
House Chair, Joint Electric Universal Service Program (EUSP) Workgroup
2004-2007
Assistant Majority Whip
2005-2006
Joint Commission on the Maryland Port Administration
2004-2006
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
1999-2006
Workers’ Compensation Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2003-2005
Chair, Property and Casualty Insurance Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2003
Electric Universal Service Program Workgroup of the Economic Matters Committee
2003-2004
Chief Deputy Majority Whip
1999-2003, 1993-1997
Joint Committee on Federal Relations
1999-2003
Health Insurance Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
1995-1998
Joint Subcommittee on Program Open Space and Agricultural Land Preservation
1995-1998
Chair, Health and Public Utilities Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
1990-1998
Environmental Matters Committee
Public Service
2015-
State Prosecutor Selection and Disabilities Commission
2007-2015
Labor and Economic Development Committee, National Conference of State Legislatures
2005-2007
Labor and Workforce Development Committee, National Conference of State Legislatures
1997-2004
Board of Trustees, Maryland Health Care Foundation
1994-2000
Power Plant Research Advisory Committee
1996
Long-Term Managed Care Advisory Committee
1995
Governor's Utility Relocation Task Force
1993-1995
Advisory Commission on Federal-State-Local Relations
1992-1994
Controlled Hazardous Substances Task Force
1989-1990
Chair, Board of Liquor License Commissioners, Baltimore City
1987-1989
Board of Liquor License Commissioners, Baltimore City
Memberships
2007-
National Aquarium in Baltimore
2007-
Advisory Board, Maryland Patient Safety Center
2005-2015
Maryland Veterans Caucus
2002-
Family Health Centers of Baltimore
2000-
Board of Directors, Federal Hill Main Street
2000-
Patriots of Fort McHenry
1997
Chair, Advisory Council, South Baltimore Learning Center
1994-
Advisory Council, South Baltimore Learning Center
1986-
Board of Directors, Bay-Vanguard Federal Savings Bank
1986-, 1982-1986
Democratic State Central Committee
1982-1984
Vice Chair, Democratic State Central Committee
Local 953, International Longshoremen's Association
Awards
2012
Casper R. Taylor Founder's Award, House of Delegates
2006
Citation, Maryland Healthy Air Act Coalition
Biographical Information
Born, Baltimore, Maryland, December 9, 1954
Cardinal Gibbons High School, 1972
Community College of Baltimore
Catonsville Community College
Loyola College
Steamship Clerk
Married, Two children

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.