Delegate Herb McMillan

2018 Regular Session

District 30A, Anne Arundel County

Delegate Herb McMillan
Annapolis Address:164 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401

Phone: 410-841-3211 | 301-858-3211 | Toll-free in MD: 1-800-492-7122 ext. 3211
Fax: 410-841--3386
Interim Address:164 House Office Building
6 Bladen Street
Annapolis, MD 21401

Phone: 410-841-3211 | 301-858-3211
Fax: 410-841--3386
Contact:Contact Online or send email to: herb.mcmillan@house.state.md.us
Tenure:First elected to the Maryland House of Delegates, 2002. Member of the House, January 8,2003 to January 10, 2007. Re-elected to the House in 2010. Member of the House January 12, 2011 to January 14, 2015 representing District 30, Anne Arundel County. Representing District 30A, Anne Arundel County, beginning January 14, 2015.
Current Assignments:2015- Chief Deputy Minority Whip
2017- Environment and Transportation Committee
2017- Environment Subcommittee of the Environment and Transportation Committee
2017- Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee of the Environment and Transportation Committee
2011- Maryland Veterans Caucus
Party Affiliation:Republican

December 8, 2017 11:17 A.M.
Past House Service
2015-2017Health and Government Operations Committee
2015-2017Insurance Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2015-2017Public Health & Minority Health Disparities of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2011-2015Environmental Matters Committee
2011-2015Housing and Real Property Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2011-2015Motor Vehicles and Transportation Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2003-2007Judiciary Committee
2003-2007Family Law Subcommittee of the Judiciary Committee
Public Service
2011-State Commission on the Capital City
2011-Chair, Capital Projects/Bond Bill Subcommittee, Anne Arundel County Delegation
2003-2007Education Subcommittee, Anne Arundel County Delegation
2003Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Licensing Boaters
1997-2001Annapolis City Council, Representing Ward 5
1997-2001Economic Matters Committee, Annapolis City Council
1997-2001Housing and Human Welfare Committee, Annapolis City Council
1997-2001Rules Committee, Annapolis City Council
Biographical Information
Born, Knoxville, Tennessee, May 30, 1958
Knoxville Catholic High School, 1976
U.S. Naval Academy, B.S., History, 1980
Central Michigan University, graduate studies , Public Administration, 1989-90
Served in U.S. Navy (Active Duty, 1980-91, U.S. Naval Reserve, 1991-, Navy Commendation Medal, 1988)
Pilot, American Airlines, 1991-
Married, Four children

December 8, 2017 11:17 A.M.