Former Delegate Pauline H. Menes

District 21


Delegate Pauline H. Menes
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 18, 1967 to January 10, 2007, representing District 21, Anne Arundel and Prince George's Counties
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
1995-2007
Parliamentarian
1979-2007
Judiciary Committee
1979-1993, 1995-2007
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
1995-2005
Legislative Policy Committee
2003
Joint Committee on the Selection of the State Treasurer
1993-1998
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
1980-1983
Joint Oversight Committee on Corrections
1987-2006
Special Committee on Drug and Alcohol Abuse (Chair)
1993-1994
Chair, Prince George's County Delegation
Biographical Information
Born in New York City, July 16, 1924
Hunter College, B.A. Business Economics and Geography, 1945
Widow, three daughters, three grandchildren
Died May 16, 2009

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.