Senator Thomas V. Mike Miller, Jr.

2014 Regular Session

District 27, Prince George's and Calvert Counties

Total Bills: 26 (Primary Sponsor: 4, Co-sponsor: 19, By Request: 3)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0133Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Rich Hill FarmhouseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0291Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - Bayfront Park and Sculptural GardenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0601 / CH0532
    (HB0741 / CH0533)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 532Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
PrimaryEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0920Criminal Procedure - Pretrial ReleaseIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0029
    (HB0096)
State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab SandwichIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0143
    (HB0353)
Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0155
    (HB0188)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0224
    (HB0364 / CH0224)
State Prosecutor and Deputy State Prosecutor - Witness Immunity - Compulsory TestimonyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0237
    (HB0381)
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for InternsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHuman Relations (D5)
SB0423
    (HB0686)
Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0430 / CH0500
    (HB1063)
Libraries - Regional Resource Centers and County Public Libraries - FundingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 500Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0515 / CH0178
    (HB1295)
Juvenile Law - Transfer of Cases to Juvenile CourtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 178Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0597Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - End Hunger WarehouseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 10:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0600 / CH0530
    (HB0742 / CH0531)
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0603 / CH0534
    (HB0740 / CH0535)
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment FundApproved by the Governor - Chapter 534Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0604 / CH0536
    (HB0743 / CH0537)
Income Tax Forms - Graphical Representation of General Fund ExpendituresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 536Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0633
    (HB1262)
Maryland Education CreditIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0646
    (HB1253)
State Health Plan - Licensed Hospice Programs - Certificate of Need ReviewIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnFinance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0772Transit Benefit DistrictsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 2:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0876 / CH0568
    (HB0811 / CH0569)
Education - Summer Career Academy Pilot ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 568Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0969
    (HB1343)
Department of Veterans Affairs - Opioid Time Lock Dispenser Pilot ProgramIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1099 / CH0374Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - Paid Rescue Squad Members and Paid Advanced Life Support Unit MembersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 374Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SJ0001 / JR0003
    (HJ0002)
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States ConstitutionSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0332 / CH0002
    (HB0297)
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0254
    (HB0365 / CH0225)
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations By Request - OtherPublic Safety (E4)
SB0602
    (HB0739 / CH0612)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.