Senator Thomas V. Mike Miller, Jr.

2016 Regular Session

District 27, Prince George's, Charles and Calvert Counties

Total Bills: 28 (Primary Sponsor: 5, Co-sponsor: 21, By Request: 2)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0172Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - Historic St. Mary's City Commission - Dove PierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0207Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Community Support Systems Food PantryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0324 / CH0013
    (HB0309)
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 13Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0502
    (HB0481)
Judges - Mandatory Retirement AgeIn the House - Second Reading PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0980Gaming - Traditional Noncommercial Fantasy Competitions - ClarificationIn the House - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryGaming (C7)
SB0179
    (HB0448)
Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0209
    (HB0634)
Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral ConsequencesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0263
    (HB1409)
Payment in Lieu of Taxes - State Forests, State Parks, and Wildlife Management AreasIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedBudget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0322 / CH0667
    (HB0378 / CH0668)
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness CampaignEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 667Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0323 / CH0011
    (HB0610)
Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act - ReauthorizationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 11Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment and Transportation
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
SB0325Juvenile Services Education - ModificationsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Co-SponsorEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0355
    (HB0431 / CH0039)
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - EstablishmentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorDisabled (O3)
SB0371
    (HB1643)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation EasementsIn the House - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsBudget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0481 / CH0556
    (HB1003 / CH0557)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkApproved by the Governor - Chapter 556Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCo-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0503Education - Online Instructional Program for Financial LiteracyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0505 / CH0394
    (HB1619)
Workers' Compensation Insurance - Premium Discount - Alcohol- and Drug-Free Workplace ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0620 / CH0415
    (HB1319)
Commemorative Weeks - Chesapeake Bay Awareness WeekApproved by the Governor - Chapter 415Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0706
    (HB1343)
Maryland Education CreditIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0905 / CH0701
    (HB0999 / CH0702)
Commission on Innovation and Excellence in EducationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701Budget and Taxation
3/1/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0907
    (HB0672)
Transportation - Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge - ReplacementVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Co-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0908
    (HB1013 / CH0036)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0910
    (HB1399)
Maryland Education Development Collaborative - EstablishedVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0982 / CH0459State Retirement and Pension System - Private Equity and Venture Capital InvestmentsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 459Budget and Taxation
3/10/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB1052 / CH0025
    (HB1607)
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25Budget and Taxation
3/1/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
SB1147Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - Historic Sotterley PlantationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1156Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public DefenderIn the House - Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/11/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1104 / CH0525
    (HB1624 / CH0526)
Transportation - Highways - Heroes HighwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB1026Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:08 P.M.