Senator Thomas V. Mike Miller, Jr.

2017 Regular Session

District 27, Prince George's, Charles and Calvert Counties

Total Bills: 28 (Primary Sponsor: 4, Co-sponsor: 24, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0100Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Studies CenterIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0612
    (HB0709)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Farming 4 Hunger Community Agricultural FacilityIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1060 / CH0574
    (HB1082 / CH0573)
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1197Public Health - Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission - Membership, Licensing, and StudiesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPublic Health (J1)
SB0138
    (HB0873 / CH0240)
Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - ExtensionVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0179Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - End Hunger In Calvert County WarehouseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0182 / CH0010
    (HB1344)
Baltimore City and Charles, Prince George's, and Harford Counties - Recall of Former Judge for Temporary Assignment - EligibilityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0254
    (HB1174)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation EasementsIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0371 / CH0550
    (HB0503 / CH0004)
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization AccountApproved by the Governor - Chapter 550Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorOperating Budget (B1)
SB0423
    (HB0345)
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Polling PlaceIn the Senate - Senate Requests House RecedeEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
SB0441 / CH0416Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - EstablishmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 416Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorSocial Services - Generally (O1)
SB0465 / CH0629
    (HB1517)
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge LoansApproved by the Governor - Chapter 629Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCo-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0505 / CH0656
    (HB0642 / CH0012)
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required FindingsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 656Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0535Highway Dedication - Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr. HighwayIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0571 / CH0017
    (HB0909)
Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection ActEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17Finance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0585Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required FindingsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0614Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Susan D. Mona CenterIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0665
    (HB0913 / CH0026)
Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0809 / CH0481
    (HB1369)
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales of Common Elements and Common AreasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 481Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorReal Property (N1)
SB0862Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Moratorium and ReferendaIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
SB0884 / CH0018
    (HB1134 / CH0781)
Maryland Financial Consumer Protection CommissionEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCo-SponsorCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0967 / CH0572
    (HB1329 / CH0571)
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
SB1001
    (HB1109 / CH0005)
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - County Boards of Education PaymentsIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-2)Budget and Taxation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/24/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB1021
    (HB1051)
Job Reinvestment Act of 2017In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB1023Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting ProcessVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB1031
    (HB1144 / CH0783)
Payroll Recovery ActIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (33-14)Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Personnel (P4)
SJ0005 / JR0001
    (HJ0003)
Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SJ0007Protection of the Federal Affordable Care ActIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:20 P.M.