Former Delegate Joseph J. Minnick

District 6


Delegate Joseph J. Minnick
TenureFirst appointed to the House January 7, 1988; Member, 1988-1991. First elected to the Maryland House of Delegates, 1994. Member of the House, January 11, 1995 to January 14, 2015 representing District 6, Baltimore County.
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
1999-2015
Economic Matters Committee
2007-2015
Alcoholic Beverages Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2011-2015, 2003-2006
Business Regulation Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2011-2015, 1999-2000
Unemployment Insurance Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2003-2015
Workers’ Compensation Benefit and Insurance Oversight Committee
2003-2010
Banking, Economic Development, Science, and Technology Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2003-2010
Workers’ Compensation Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
1999-2010
Deathcare Industry Workgroup of the Economic Matters Committee
1999-2007
Alcoholic Beverages Workgroup of the Economic Matters Committee
2003
Joint Committee on the Selection of the State Treasurer
1999-2003
Real Estate and Housing Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
1995-1998
Commerce and Government Matters Committee
1995-1998
Motor Vehicles Subcommittee of the Commerce and Government Matters Committee
1995-1998
State Government and Civil Rights Subcommittee of the Commerce and Government Matters Committee
1995-1998
Deputy Majority Whip
1988-1990
Judiciary Committee
Public Service
2007-2015
Chair, Maryland Correctional Enterprises Management Council
2007-2012
Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness
1995-2006
Chair, Baltimore County Delegation
Memberships
2007-2015
House Co-Chair, Maryland Veterans Caucus (Member, 2005-)
2001-2015
Maryland Legislative Sportsmen's Caucus
1990-1992
Restaurant Association of Maryland, Board of Directors
1986
Democratic State Central Committee, Baltimore County
1975-1976
President, Baltimore County Licensed Beverage Association
Veterans of Foreign Wars Post no. 6694
American Legion Post no. 38
Knights of Columbus
Biographical Information
Born, Dundalk, Maryland, March 16, 1933
Dundalk Community College, 1972-73
Dundalk High School, 1952
Essex Community College, 1974
Served in U.S. Navy, 1952-56 (Good Conduct Medal)
Business
Married, Three children
Died in Timonium, Maryland, October 12, 2015

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.