Former Senator Clarence M. Mitchell, IV

District 44


Senator Clarence M. Mitchell, IV
TenureMember of the Senate January 13, 1999 to January 8, 2003, representing District 44, Baltimore City Member of the House of Delegates January 11, 1995 to January 13, 1999, representing District 44, Baltimore City
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past Senate Service
1999-2003
Judicial Proceedings Committee
2001-2003
Rules Committee (Chair)
1999-2003
Joint Committee on Federal Relations
Past House Service
1995-1999
Ways and Means Committee
1995-1999
Joint Audit Committee
Biographical Information
Born in Baltimore, Maryland, May 16, 1962
University of Maryland, College Park
Morgan State University

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.