Former Senator Karen S. Montgomery

District 14


Senator Karen S. Montgomery
TenureMember of the Senate January 12, 2011 to January 1, 2016. Resigned January 1, 2016. Member of the House of Delegates, representing District 14, Montgomery County, January 8, 2003 to January 12, 2011.
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past Senate Service
2011-2016
Education, Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
2015-2016
Co-Chair, Environment Subcommittee of the Education, Health and Environmental Affairs Committee (Member 2011-2016)
2011-2014
Joint Committee on Access to Mental Health Services
2013-2016
Health Subcommittee of the Education, Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
2012-2014
Alcoholic Beverage Subcommittee of the Education, Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
2011-2015
Education Subcommittee of the Education, Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
2011-2015
Ethics and Election Law Subcommittee of the Education, Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
2011-2015
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation Subcommittee of the Education, Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
2015
Senate Chair, Joint Subcommittee on Program Open Space and Agricultural Land Preservation
2015
Joint Committee on Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Areas
2011-2015
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
2003-2016
Women Legislators of Maryland
2005-2016
Maryland Veterans Caucus
Past House Service
2007-2011
Health and Government Operations Committee
2007-2011
Government Operations Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2007-2011
Public Health and Long-term Care Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2003-2006
Environmental Matters Committee
2003-2006
Agriculture, Agriculture Preservation and Open Space Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2003
Ethics Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2003
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2004-2006
Motor Vehicles and Transportation Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2005-2006
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommitteeof the Environmental Matters Committee
2004
Co-Chair, Electronics Recycling Work Group of the Environmental Matters Committee
2008-2009
President, Women Legislators of Maryland
Public Service
2011-2016
Maryland Commission on Disabilities
2013-2016
Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States Constitution
2007-2011
Vice Chair, Land Use and Transportation Committee, Montgomery County Delegation
2010
Long-Term Care Reform Work Group (DHMH)
2008-2010
Veterans Behavioral Health Advisory Board
2009-2012
Maryland Commission on Autism
2008-2009
President, Women Legislators of Maryland
2008
Public Safety Policy Committee, Metropolitan Washington Council of Governments
2007-2008
Task Force to Study the Developmental Disabilities Administration Rate-Payment System
2007-2008
Statewide Commission on the Shortage in the Health Care Workforce
2007-2008
President-Elect, Women Legislators of Maryland
2007-2016
Health Committee, National Conference of State Legislatures
2007-2016
Agriculture, Environment and Energy Committee, National Conference of State Legislatures
2007
Vice Chair, Transportation Committee, Montgomery County Delegation
2005-2007
Agriculture and Rural Development Standing Committee, National Conference of State Legislatures
2004-2007
First Vice President, Women Legislators of Maryland
2003-2007
Transportation Committee, Montgomery County Delegation
2006
Chair, Endorsement Committee, Women Legislators of Maryland
2005-2006
Governor's Commission for Protecting the Chesapeake Bay through Sustainable Forestry
2005-2006
Second Vice President, Women Legislators of Maryland
2004
Task Force on Parking for Individuals with Disabilities
Former Member, Commission on Aging, Montgomery County
Memberships
2003-2016
Maryland Bicycle and Pedestrian Caucus
2003-2016
Maryland Green Caucus
Board Member, Arts for the Aging
Women's Committee, Washington Ballet
Founding Member, Montgomery Women
Community Services for Autistic Adults and Children
Montgomery County Community Television
Former Member, Brookeville Historic Preservation Committee
Awards
2008
Certificate of Appreciation, Maryland Municipal League
Biographical Information
Born, Middletown, New York, August 23, 1935
Western High School, Baltimore, 1953
Towson University, B.S., Science Education, 1957
George Washington University, M.F.A., 1976
Faculty, George Washington University, Fine Arts Department (teaching sculpture and design), 1974-87
Executive Director, The Art Barn Gallery, 1982-85
Public Programs Coordinator, National Building Museum, 1985-86
Assistant Director of Development, National Rehabilitation Hospital, 1987-89
Director of Development, Olney Theatre Center, 1989-94, 1999-2000
Development Coordinator for Bruce Adams Campaign for County Executive, 1994
Executive Director, Arts for the Aging, Inc., 1994-96
Director of Personal Giving, Arthritis Foundation, 1996-99
Married; three children; four grandchildren

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.